MD HB1301 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 760
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 760
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the authority of school crossing guards to direct traffic by authorizing a school crossing guard who meets specified qualifications to direct vehicles and pedestrians on a highway or on school grounds in order to assist nonschool vehicles in entering and leaving school grounds.
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Crossing Guards - Authority to Direct Traffic
Sponsors
Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Del. Mark Chang [D] | Del. Ana Gutierrez [D] | Del. James Tarlau [D] |
Del. Anne Healey [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 760 |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment Withdrawn |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {548779/1 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {720810/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Highways
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicles
Public Schools
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Education, Boards of
Highways
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicles
Public Schools
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road