MD HB1299 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting certain physicians from having a financial relationship with each other; repealing a provision of law providing that a physician is not liable for certain damages or subject to a certain penalty under certain circumstances; prohibiting a physician from performing or inducing or attempting to perform or induce an abortion before making a certain determination; requiring a physician to use a certain method for detecting a certain heartbeat; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Abortions - Modifications

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2020-03-10HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-14HouseHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General20207(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General20208(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General20209(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General20210(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General20211(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General20212(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General20213(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback