MD HB1293 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that an application for a certain license renewal is not complete without a certain affidavit; extending in Baltimore City the time during which the Board of License Commissioners may issue a Class A-7 license; altering the hours of operation for a holder of a Class A-7 license; requiring the holder of a Class A license, Class A-2 license, or Class A-7 license to install and operate a digital surveillance system on the licensed premises in accordance with regulations that the Board adopts; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – Class A, A–2, and A–7 Licenses – Surveillance System

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {113094/1 Adopted
2020-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB69 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 510

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages12102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages121407(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages121804.2(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages12902.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback