MD HB1293 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the University of Maryland, Baltimore, in cooperation with the Maryland Higher Education Commission, the Johns Hopkins School of Nursing, and the State Board of Nursing to conduct a study and make recommendations to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2013, regarding barriers and obstacles to establishing additional nurse midwifery programs in the State; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education and Health Occupations - Nurse Midwifery Program - Study

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-20HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn
2013-03-14HouseHearing cancelled
2013-03-14HouseHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback