MD HB1291 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "health care facility" to exempt from the certificate of need requirements hospitals that are providing certain hospice program services to patients admitted to the hospital.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Facilities - Certificate of Need - Exemption for Hospitals Providing Hospice Program Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2020-02-27HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-14HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General19114(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback