MD HB1290 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing certain home improvement contractors to obtain the full contract price of a home improvement contract by posting an irrevocable letter of credit in an amount equal to $100,000 per home improvement contract but not exceeding $2,000,000; authorizing certain owners to file a complaint with the Division of Consumer Protection in the Office of the Attorney General under certain circumstances; requiring the Division to notify the contractor, investigate a certain complaint, and make certain determinations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Protection - Home Improvement Contractors - Home Improvement Contracts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseReferred to interim study by Economic Matters
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB1016 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-12 - First Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business Regulation8501.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation8617(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law13201(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law13204(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback