MD HB1289 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland State's Attorney's Association to develop and distribute to each State's Attorney's Office in the State a certain certification form; requiring a prosecuting attorney to request that a victim or victim's representative certify that the victim or victim's representative has received a certain notice of the terms of any plea agreement; requiring a prosecuting attorney to retain a copy of the certification as part of the prosecuting attorney's case file; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Victims and Victims' Representatives - Plea Agreements (The Victim Empowerment in Plea Deals Act of 2020)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06HouseUnfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
2020-03-04HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Procedure11103(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Procedure11104(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Procedure11206(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback