MD HB1287 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 796
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 796
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing alcohol and drug trainees to practice clinical drug and alcohol counseling without a license or drug and alcohol counseling without a certificate through telehealth if the individuals are working as trainees under the supervision of certain approved supervisors while completing certain experiential or course study requirements.
Title
Alcohol and Drug Counseling - Alcohol and Drug Trainees - Practice Through Telehealth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 796 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB646 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 797
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Communications
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Counselors
Drugs
Health
Health Occupations
internet
Job Training
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Substance Abuse
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Video
Virtual Environments
Communications
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Counselors
Drugs
Health
Health Occupations
internet
Job Training
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Substance Abuse
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Video
Virtual Environments
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 1 | 1001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 17 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |