MD HB1287 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Anne Arundel County Board of License Commissioners from revoking an alcoholic beverages license for an entertainment facility for a violation of certain nudity and sexual display restrictions if the holder of the license operates a performance area that is primarily devoted to the arts or theatrical performances and the performances express matters of serious literary, artistic, scientific, or political value; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Facility License - Revocation of Local Licenses
Sponsors
Del. Sid Saab [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2020-02-13 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB405 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Subjects
Advertising
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Anne Arundel County
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Crimes and Punishments
Emergency Bills
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Penalties and Sentences
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Anne Arundel County
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Crimes and Punishments
Emergency Bills
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Penalties and Sentences
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 2104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 4 | 605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |