MD HB1287 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-31 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-31 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing the student member of the State Board of Education to vote on the State Board's budget.
Title
State Board of Education - Student Member Voting Rights Act
Sponsors
Del. Saqib Ali [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2010-03-28 | Third Reading Passed (114-22) | |
2010-03-26 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-02-22 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-18 | First Reading Ways and Means |