MD HB1286 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 839
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the State or its reporting agency from entering into certain contracts or plans related to the redevelopment of a certain project at State Center unless certain criteria are met; requiring certain criteria to be included in any new or modified plans for the redevelopment of a certain project; requiring the participation of community associations in the process for a certain redevelopment project; providing for the application of the Act; and making the provisions of the Act severable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Center - Redevelopment - Requirements, Participation, and Process

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (109-27) (Y: 110 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-26HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 839
2018-04-02HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-30SenateThird Reading Passed (45-1)
2018-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-29SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-29SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (109-27)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {946489/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback