MD HB1286 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $150,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Trustees of the Silver Spring Jewish Center, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Silver Spring Learning Center, located in Montgomery County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Silver Spring Learning Center Expansion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Cullison) Adopted (134-2) (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2015-03-17 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2015-03-16 | House | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Cullison) Adopted (134-2) |
2015-03-13 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |