MD HB1285 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to reclassify an oyster sanctuary in which the oyster population has declined by 15% or more over a 10-year period as an oyster growth sanctuary; establishing the purpose of an oyster growth sanctuary; requiring that any activity conducted in an oyster growth sanctuary comply with certain adaptive management practices; and requiring that an oyster growth sanctuary be considered an oyster sanctuary for purposes of calculating a certain oyster habitat objective.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources - Reclassification of Oyster Sanctuaries - Authorization

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2020-02-25HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB678 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Natural Resources41014.5(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources4215(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback