MD HB1283 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a Class B-CL beer, wine, and liquor license providing for use at a cigar lounge in Prince George's County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue a Class B-CL license for use at a cigar lounge under certain circumstances; setting forth certain requirements for an applicant for the license; specifying that the license authorizes the holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption on certain days and during certain hours; establishing an annual license fee of $900; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Lounge License PG 312-20

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-20HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-14HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages261001.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages26102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages261604(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General24504(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General24505(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback