MD HB1283 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 75-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering, from a 6-month to a 12-month period, the length for which a certain insurer, nonprofit health service plan, and health maintenance organization is required to provide coverage for a single dispensing of a supply of prescription contraceptives; providing that a certain provision of the Act may not be construed to require a provider to prescribe, furnish, or dispense contraceptives for 12 months at one time; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance - Prescription Contraceptives - Coverage for Single Dispensing

Sponsors

Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Bilal Ali [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]Del. Angela Angel [D]
Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Charles Barkley [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Darryl Barnes [D]
Del. Erek Barron [D]Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]
Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]Del. Dereck Davis [D]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]
Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. Bob Flanagan [R]Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]
Del. William Frick [D]Del. Barbara Frush [D]Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]Del. Angela Gibson [D]
Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]Del. Antonio Hayes [D]
Del. Keith Haynes [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Sheila Hixson [D]Del. Marvin Holmes [D]
Del. Carolyn Howard [D]Del. Jay Jalisi [D]Del. Adrienne Jones [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]
Del. Tony Knotts [D]Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Benjamin Kramer [D]Del. Clarence Lam [D]
Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]
Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Cory McCray [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Aruna Miller [D]
Del. David Moon [D]Del. Marice Morales [D]Del. Dan Morhaim [D]Del. Nick Mosby [D]
Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Andrew Platt [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]
Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Del. Shane Robinson [D]Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]
Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]
Del. James Tarlau [D]Del. Frank Turner [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Jeff Waldstreicher [D]
Del. Alonzo Washington [D]Del. Mary Washington [D]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. Karen Young [D]
Del. Pat Young [D]Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]
Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R]Del. Christian Miele [R]

Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 450
2018-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (135-1)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {416482/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback