MD HB1282 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "Health Enterprise Zone practitioner", for purposes of provisions of law governing Health Enterprise Zones, to require that a health care practitioner included in the defined term be trained in trauma-informed care.
Title
Health Enterprise Zone Practitioners - Trauma-Informed Care - Training
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2016-03-07 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Emergencies
Enterprise Zones
Grants
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Mental Health
Public Health
Records
Emergencies
Enterprise Zones
Grants
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Mental Health
Public Health
Records