MD HB1281 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Codifying the Bikeways Network Program to provide grant support for bicycle network development activities; requiring the Department of Transportation to establish certain eligibility criteria; requiring the Governor to provide at least $3,800,000 each year from the Transportation Trust Fund for the Program; requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to present a draft transit plan 45 days before finalization to include provisions for reliable transit services to enable certain residents to access certain job opportunities; etc.
Title
Transportation – Bikeways Network Program and Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (103-33) (Y: 103 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-13) (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (101-33) (Y: 102 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-13) (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (101-33) (Y: 102 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-33) |
2019-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (33-13) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {159335/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-33) |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {714165/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-27 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation) |
2019-02-27 | House | Hearing canceled (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation) |
2019-02-18 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation) |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Appropriations
Bicycles
Boundaries
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Counties
Governor
Grants
Maps and Charts
Mass Transit
Municipal Corporations
Reports
Safety
Sports and Recreation
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Zoning and Planning
Bicycles
Boundaries
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Counties
Governor
Grants
Maps and Charts
Mass Transit
Municipal Corporations
Reports
Safety
Sports and Recreation
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Zoning and Planning