MD HB1280 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to establish a demonstration program supported by State general funds to cover health care services provided to certain individuals that are not covered by the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; authorizing the Department to establish eligibility criteria for and a cap on enrollment in the demonstration program; requiring the Department by December 1, 2020, to submit to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly a certain report on the demonstration program; etc.
Title
Maryland Department of Health – Enrollees in the Employed Individuals with Disabilities Program – Demonstration Program
Sponsors
Del. Marc Korman [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-4) (Y: 131 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-4) (Y: 131 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446 |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-04-09 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-4) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {966887/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Diseases
Health
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Patients
Prices
Public Health
Reports
Sunset
Disabilities
Diseases
Health
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Patients
Prices
Public Health
Reports
Sunset