MD HB128 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the date, from October 1 to December 1 of each year, by which the Secretary of Disabilities must submit an annual analysis of the State's progress in implementing the State Disabilities Plan and related performance objectives to the Governor and the General Assembly; altering the membership of the Interagency Disabilities Board; and altering the required elements of the State Disabilities Plan.
Title
State Disabilities Plan and Interagency Disabilities Board - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211 |
2017-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2017-02-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-14 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-08 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-01-31 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m. |
2017-01-18 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Assessments
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Disabilities, Department of
Disabled
Mental and Behavioral Health
Reports
Assessments
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Disabilities, Department of
Disabled
Mental and Behavioral Health
Reports