MD HB128 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-8)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-8)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the dates by which specified applications for the homestead property tax credit for specified dwellings are required to be filed with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation; altering the taxable years in which the tax credit may not be granted for specified dwellings under specified circumstances; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Homestead Tax Credit - Eligibility Verification and Application
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26 |
2013-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2013-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {785969/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2013-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-17 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |