MD HB1279 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that a certain refill be dispensed in the smallest commercially available package under certain circumstances if a prescription cannot be dispensed or sold in a 14-day or less supply or unit of use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacists - Refills of Prescriptions - Dispensing Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateReassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-14SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {956484/1 Adopted
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health Occupations12506(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback