MD HB1279 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission to adopt certain procurement regulations relating to source selection; authorizing the Commission to adopt regulations establishing a minority business enterprise program if it determines that there is a compelling interest to implement remedial measures to assist certain minority- and women-owned businesses; requiring the Commission to report the findings of a certain study to certain persons on or before January 1, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Procurement - Source Selection MC/PG 112-19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 354
2019-04-06HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-04-06HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {834536/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-16HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1279&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1279f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1279t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1279e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_354_hb1279e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb1279_83453601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb1279.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1279_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0741.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1279_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1426.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1212.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback