MD HB1279 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-08 - Re-referred Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-08 - Re-referred Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person who was convicted of one or more charges in a specified unit to file a petition to shield other charges in the unit that were disposed of by acquittal, dismissal, or specified other means; requiring the Administrative Office of the Courts to shield specified information within 30 days after receipt of a petition under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charges Not Resulting in Conviction - Shielding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 78 N: 55 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-08 | Re-referred Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-31 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2011-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (78-55) | |
2011-03-29 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2011-03-23 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-22 | Re-referred Judiciary | |
2011-02-24 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Electronic Government
Expungement
Fees
Law Enforcement
Petitions
Privacy
Records
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Electronic Government
Expungement
Fees
Law Enforcement
Petitions
Privacy
Records