MD HB1274 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting a certain retiree of the Employees' Retirement and Pension Systems from a certain earnings limitation when the retiree is reemployed by a certain previous employer for a certain time period to assist with the administration of federally funded grants or projects related to the COVID-19 pandemic; and providing for the retroactive application of the Act to January 1, 2020.
Title
Employees' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment Earnings Limitation - COVID-19 Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227 |
2023-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2023-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2023-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {153620/1 Adopted |
2023-03-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2023-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-06 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-02-23 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
COVID-19
Emergency Bills
Health
Health, Department of
Public Health
Retirement
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Emergency Bills
Health
Health, Department of
Public Health
Retirement
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment