MD HB1274 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a police officer to inform a minor of whether the minor is free to leave before questioning the minor for any purpose; requiring a police officer immediately to inform a certain minor that the minor is not free to leave under certain circumstances; requiring a police officer to provide certain notice to a minor's parent, legal guardian, or attorney if the minor has been arrested; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Questioning of Minors by Police Officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Arrests
Attorneys
Electronic Communication
Investigations and Inquiries
Juvenile Law
Law Enforcement
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Public Safety
Attorneys
Electronic Communication
Investigations and Inquiries
Juvenile Law
Law Enforcement
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Public Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 2 | 109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |