MD HB1274 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a police officer to inform a minor of whether the minor is free to leave before questioning the minor for any purpose; requiring a police officer immediately to inform a certain minor that the minor is not free to leave under certain circumstances; requiring a police officer to provide certain notice to a minor's parent, legal guardian, or attorney if the minor has been arrested; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Questioning of Minors by Police Officers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17HouseUnfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
2020-02-11HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Procedure2109(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback