MD HB1274 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Opioid Restitution Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund which consists of all revenue received by the State from any source resulting, directly or indirectly, from any judgement against or settlement with, opioid manufacturers, opioid research associations or any other person related to the opioid industry; specifying the purpose of the Fund; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund, and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; requiring interest earnings of the Fund to be credited to the Fund; etc.
Title
Opioid Restitution Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {954766/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorney General
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Education
Emergencies
Governor
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Industry and Technology
Interest
Law Enforcement
Medical Treatments
Operating Budget
Opioids
Private Schools
Public Health
Public Schools
Reports
Restitution
Revenue and Taxes
Substance Abuse
Treasurers
Attorney General
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Education
Emergencies
Governor
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Industry and Technology
Interest
Law Enforcement
Medical Treatments
Operating Budget
Opioids
Private Schools
Public Health
Public Schools
Reports
Restitution
Revenue and Taxes
Substance Abuse
Treasurers