MD HB1274 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Opioid Restitution Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund which consists of all revenue received by the State from any source resulting, directly or indirectly, from any judgement against or settlement with, opioid manufacturers, opioid research associations or any other person related to the opioid industry; specifying the purpose of the Fund; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund, and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; requiring interest earnings of the Fund to be credited to the Fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opioid Restitution Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 537
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-20SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {954766/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-02-14HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
2019-02-13HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback