MD HB1272 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing in Harford County a resort complex license; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue one resort complex license to a certain person; specifying that the license authorizes the holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor at certain outlets in the resort complex; establishing the days and times during which a license holder may serve alcoholic beverages; exempting the resort complex license from certain license quotas or restrictions; establishing a certain fee; providing certain alcohol awareness training requirements; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {923497/1 Adopted
2020-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages221005.2(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages22102(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback