MD HB1272 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB287
Note: Carry Foward to future HB465
Note: Carry Foward to future SB482
Note: Carry Foward to future HB465
Note: Carry Foward to future SB482
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing in Harford County a resort complex license; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue one resort complex license to a certain person; specifying that the license authorizes the holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor at certain outlets in the resort complex; establishing the days and times during which a license holder may serve alcoholic beverages; exempting the resort complex license from certain license quotas or restrictions; establishing a certain fee; providing certain alcohol awareness training requirements; etc.
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {923497/1 Adopted |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB1272 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1272 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1272 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1272 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1272 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Fees
Food
Harford County
Hotels and Motels
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Public Buildings and Facilities
Restaurants
Retail Sales
Sports and Recreation
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Fees
Food
Harford County
Hotels and Motels
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Public Buildings and Facilities
Restaurants
Retail Sales
Sports and Recreation
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 1005.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |