MD HB127 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB18
Note: Carry Over of previous HB890
Note: Carry Over of previous HB890
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Hester) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Hester) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain producers or a representative organization to submit a plan for the establishment of a Paint Stewardship Program to the Department of the Environment on or before January 1, 2022, and in accordance with certain requirements; requiring the Department to review and approve certain plans, including a certain assessment, submitted in accordance with the Paint Stewardship Program; prohibiting the sale of certain architectural paint under certain circumstances on a certain date; etc.
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Hester) Adopted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Floor Amendment {783922/1 (Senator Ready) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Floor Amendment {473923/1 (Senator Ready) Withdrawn |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Floor Amendment {473923/1 (Senator Ready) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Floor Amendment {204837/1 (Senator Hester) Adopted |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-43) |
2021-02-23 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-22 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-01-11 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters |
2020-06-19 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB127 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Hester) Adopted
HB890 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB890 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Architects
Auditors and Audits
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Data
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Examinations
Fees
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
internet
Nonprofit Organizations
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Auditors and Audits
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Data
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Examinations
Fees
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
internet
Nonprofit Organizations
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 1701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1733 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |