MD HB1269 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County or of a municipal corporation in Anne Arundel County to grant, by law, a tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on real property owned and used as a principal residence by an individual who is at least 62 years old and of limited income; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2017; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors of Limited Income
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60 |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2017-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {545069/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Elderly Persons
Property Tax
Real Property
Salaries and Compensation
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Elderly Persons
Property Tax
Real Property
Salaries and Compensation
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local