MD HB1268 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 508
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Rape Kit Testing Grant Fund to provide law enforcement agencies with funding to pay for testing of sexual assault evidence collection kits by forensic laboratories; requiring the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to administer the Fund and to establish and publish procedures for the distribution of funding; limiting the use of funds to the equipment, supplies, personnel, and outsourcing necessary for the testing of sexual assault evidence collection kits; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Rape Kit Testing Grant Fund - Established

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 508
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-08SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {464267/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback