MD HB1268 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing from $250,000 to $500,000 the aggregate amount of State income tax credits the Department of Housing and Community Development is authorized to issue in a taxable year for donations to certain qualified permanent endowment funds at certain community foundations; allowing a credit against the State income tax in the amount of 25% of a proposed donation to a qualified endowment fund at an institution of higher education; providing the total amount of tax credit certificates certified may not exceed $250,000; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax Credit – Donations to Endowment Funds – Community Foundations and Historically Black Colleges and Universities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {765162/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-03-02HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback