MD HB1263 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to implement a procedure at the William Preston Lane, Jr. Memorial Chesapeake Bay Bridge by July 1, 2024, that requires that all tolls be paid by a specified electronic means except at a single "cash only" lane that the Authority may provide for the payment of tolls in cash.
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll Collection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Bridges and Tunnels
Chesapeake Bay
Electronic Funds Transfer
Fees
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Bridges and Tunnels
Chesapeake Bay
Electronic Funds Transfer
Fees
Transportation
Transportation - Highways