MD HB1262 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Extending the time periods within which a person claiming to be aggrieved by a certain discriminatory act or housing practice is required to file a complaint with the Commission on Civil Rights; and altering the date that begins the time period within which certain complaints must be filed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human Relations – Employment Discrimination and Discriminatory Housing Practices – Time to File Complaint

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (106-31) (Y: 107 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (106-31)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {116082/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback