MD HB1261 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Altering certain provisions of law related to the execution of wills, powers of attorney, and advance directives to authorize the electronic execution and remote witnessing of those documents under certain circumstances; providing that a will, a power of attorney, a notarization of a power of attorney, or an advance directive executed in conformance with the provisions of certain executive orders shall be deemed to satisfy certain requirements under the Act; applying the Act retroactively; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives – Electronic Execution

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-10HousePassed Enrolled
2021-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (134-3)
2021-04-10HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2021-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (46-1)
2021-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {758275/1 Adopted
2021-03-31SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-18SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (130-5)
2021-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {422515/1 Adopted
2021-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2021-02-10HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

SB820 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-09 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Estates and Trusts1101(n/a)See Bill Text
Estates and Trusts17101(n/a)See Bill Text
Estates and Trusts17110(n/a)See Bill Text
Estates and Trusts4101(n/a)See Bill Text
Estates and Trusts4102(n/a)See Bill Text
Estates and Trusts4104(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General5601(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General5602(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback