MD HB126 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of an outstanding warrant for arrest for purposes of specified provisions of the Maryland Vehicle Law governing suspension of drivers' licenses and vehicle registrations to provide that the arrest warrant shall be at least 61 days old.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Outstanding Arrest Warrants - Drivers' Licenses and Vehicle Registrations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-09 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2010-03-17 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-02-24 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2010-02-23 Third Reading Passed (89-49)
2010-02-18 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-02-16 Special Order 2/18 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
2010-02-10 Special Order 2/16 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
2010-02-10 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2010-02-08 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2010-01-25 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-01-25 Hearing cancelled
2010-01-15 Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
2010-01-18 First Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback