MD HB1257 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to reimburse businesses affected in a certain manner by certain COVID-19 restrictions that file a business personal property tax return during the period from January 1, 2021, to April 15, 2021, for the full amount of business personal property tax paid by the businesses in calendar year 2020; requiring the Department to reimburse eligible businesses exclusively out of certain State funds and in the order in which the businesses filed personal property tax returns; etc.
Title
Business Personal Property Tax – Businesses Affected by COVID–19 Restrictions – Reimbursement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appropriations
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Commerce and Business
COVID-19
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Personal Property
Property Tax
Reimbursement Rates
Sunset
Taxes - Property
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Commerce and Business
COVID-19
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Personal Property
Property Tax
Reimbursement Rates
Sunset
Taxes - Property
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1257?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb1257f.pdf |