MD HB1255 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a contract for the sale of certain residential property to include a certain information concerning the homestead property tax credit; requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to design a document about the homestead tax credit that must be presented to the buyer at the settlement for the property; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homestead and Homeowners' Property Tax Credits - Access and Eligibility

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {739635/1 Adopted
2021-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2021-03-23SenateHearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-22SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2021-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2021-03-19HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {635065/1 Adopted
2021-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2021-02-10HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Real Property14117(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property14812(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property9104(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property9105(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback