MD HB1255 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of the Environment and the Department of Transportation to jointly provide technical assistance to certain entities on certain matters; establishing the Zero-Emission Vehicle School Bus Transition Grant Program to provide grants to county boards of education and entities that contract with county board to provide transportation services to purchase zero-emission school buses, install charging infrastructure, and develop plans for transitioning to the use of zero-emission vehicles; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Bus Transition – Zero–Emission Vehicles – Grant Program and Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (35-11) (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-37) (Y: 103 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 492
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (35-11)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (102-37)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {855061/2 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-15HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
2019-02-15HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means and Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback