MD HB1255 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a person convicted of a single felony theft of property or of services with a value of $300 or more who completed the sentence imposed for the conviction, including probation, to petition for the expungement of records pertaining to the conviction that are maintained by the State or a political subdivision of the State; prohibiting the petition from being filed until 10 years after the conviction, provided that the 10-year period includes satisfactory completion of the sentence and any probation; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Police and Court Records - Felony Theft - Expungement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-25 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
2011-03-23 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-03-22 Re-referred Judiciary
2011-02-22 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback