MD HB1253 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "abandoned vessel" to include a sunken vessel but exclude specified historic property or submerged archaeological historic property; clarifying that specified provisions of law relating to the removal and disposal of abandoned vessels apply to sunken vessels; extending liability protections for damage that may occur during removal, storage, or custody of an abandoned or sunken vessel to a person that removes, preserves, or stores the abandoned or sunken vessel on behalf of the Department of Natural Resources; etc.
Title
State Boat Act - Removal of Abandoned or Sunken Vessels
Sponsors
Del. Bob Long [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2017-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {380316/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-18 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Stein) Adopted |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {380316/1 |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Abandoned Property
Boats and Ships
Historical Matters
Liability
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Rules and Regulations
Boats and Ships
Historical Matters
Liability
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Rules and Regulations