MD HB1253 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the annual fees and surcharges for specified commercial fishing licenses and authorizations; requiring that specified tidal fish licensees obtain a harvester registration from the Department of Natural Resources; authorizing the Department to issue a permit authorizing a person to commercially harvest specified fish species, subject to specified annual fees; repealing provisions of law that authorize the Department to establish and issue a commercial fishing apprenticeship permit; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Licensing
Sponsors
Del. Jay Jacobs [R] | Del. Charles Otto [R] | Del. Michael Weir [D] | Del. John Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-5) (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (110-26) (Y: 110 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (110-26) (Y: 110 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2013-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (38-5) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (110-26) |
2013-03-22 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-22 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Glass) Adopted |
2013-03-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments {760614/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Advertising
Annotated Code of Maryland
Apprentices
Appropriations
Commerce and Business
Crabs
Dealers
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Legislative Services, Department of
Licenses
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonresidents
Notices
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment
Annotated Code of Maryland
Apprentices
Appropriations
Commerce and Business
Crabs
Dealers
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Legislative Services, Department of
Licenses
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonresidents
Notices
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment