MD HB1253 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing to 21 the number of members of the Commission on African American History and Culture; repealing the requirement that the Commission survey historic buildings, sites, artifacts, archives, and repositories, and publish and disseminate the results; repealing the requirement that the Commission plan, coordinate, and implement the State's annual official observance of the Martin Luther King, Jr., holiday; altering the requirement that the Commission receive and administer specified money for specified purposes; etc.
Title
Commission on African American History and Culture - Members and Duties
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-28 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2011-03-21 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-01 | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | Re-referred Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-22 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Committees and Commissions
Historical Matters
Holidays and Special Dates
Minorities
Committees and Commissions
Historical Matters
Holidays and Special Dates
Minorities