MD HB125 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 914
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 914
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain provisions of law relating to the recordation and inspection of certain military records kept by the clerk of a circuit court to authorize the clerk to keep an electronic record instead of a book to record and index the discharge papers of a person who has served in the uniformed services of the United States; and requiring the clerk to deny inspection of the electronic record except under certain circumstances.
Title
Courts – Military Records – Recordation and Inspection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 914 |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2024-03-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {403527/1 Adopted |
2024-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2024-01-10 | House | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2023-09-29 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB159 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 913
Subjects
Armed Forces
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Electronic Documents
Electronic Government
Privacy
Recordation
Records
Social Security
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Electronic Documents
Electronic Government
Privacy
Recordation
Records
Social Security
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 2 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |