MD HB125 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Declaring certain findings of the General Assembly regarding the educational needs and the health and safety of student athletes; prohibiting a public institution of higher education or certain organizations from preventing a student athlete from earning compensation from the use of the athlete's name, image or likeness; prohibiting a public institution of higher education from providing a prospective student athlete with certain compensation or preventing the athlete from obtaining certain legal representation; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Institutions of Higher Education – Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-26HouseFloor Amendment {323921/1 (Delegate Walker) Rejected
2021-02-25HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Walker) Adopted
2021-02-25HouseMotion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
2021-02-23HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
2021-02-23HouseFavorable with Amendments {723922/1 Adopted
2021-02-22HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2021-01-11HouseHearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2020-09-08HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB439 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback