MD HB125 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the Board of Public Works from approving the acquisition of certain real property with an appraised value of at least $500,000 unless the Board has provided the Legislative Policy Committee with certain information; prohibiting the Board from approving the acquisition of real property with an appraised value of at least $500,000 from the federal government until the Board provides a certain notice and, on a certain request, a study assessing the ongoing fiscal impact the acquisition would have on the State; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18HousePassed Enrolled
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (129-1)
2020-03-18HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments {814833/1 Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-28SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-27HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2020-02-25HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-25HouseFavorable with Amendments {756584/1 Adopted
2020-02-24HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-01-21HouseHearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-15HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB148 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Finance and Procurement10305(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback