MD HB125 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a solar photovoltaic recycling fee; requiring a person installing a solar electric generating facility in the State to pay the fee beginning October 1, 2019; establishing the Solar Photovoltaic Recycling Fund; requiring 20% of the first sale price of each renewable energy credit sold to be deposited into the Fund; providing that the purpose of the Fund is to provide funding for technologies and processes that assist with the recycling of solar photovoltaic systems; etc.
Title
Solar Photovoltaic Recycling
Sponsors
Del. Warren Miller [R] | Del. Christopher Adams [R] | Del. Steven Arentz [R] | Del. Mark Fisher [R] |
Del. Seth Howard [R] | Del. Richard Impallaria [R] | Sen. Johnny Mautz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-01-23 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 1:30 p.m. |
2019-01-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Alternative Energy Sources
Budgets
Communications
Comptroller
Counties
Energy
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Fees
Industry and Technology
Interest
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Oaths
Prices
Recycling
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sales and Use Tax
Time
Treasurers
Utility Regulation
Alternative Energy Sources
Budgets
Communications
Comptroller
Counties
Energy
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Fees
Industry and Technology
Interest
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Oaths
Prices
Recycling
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sales and Use Tax
Time
Treasurers
Utility Regulation