MD HB1249 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Pilot Program for Preventing HIV Infection for Rape Victims to be administered by the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and to provide a victim of an alleged rape or sexual offense or a victim of alleged child sexual abuse treatment and follow-up care for postexposure prophylaxis for the prevention of HIV infection; providing that payments made to certain health care providers from the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board may not exceed a total of $750,000 annually; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pilot Program - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-29SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Finance
2019-03-28SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {416489/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-13HouseHearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2019-02-13HouseHearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
2019-02-13HouseHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback